THE SANDYACRES TRUST

Charity number: 1121198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A To provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the condtions of life B To establish or secure the establishment of a community centre at Sandyacres, Ashford and manage and maintain the same in furtherence of the objects of the Trust C To promote such other charitable purposes as may from time to time be determine

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 02 February 2024

Total income: £24,795
Total expenditure: £4,324

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WINSTON MICHAEL Chair 16 March 2012
None on record
Larry William Krause Trustee 25 September 2019
ASHFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ASHFORD ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE THOMAS TURNER D D CHARITY (ONE OF THE ASHFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES)
Received: On time
THOMAS TREHEARNE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MAYOR OF ASHFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Ernest Alfred Warren Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Anton Richard Banham Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Fred Dunkerley Trustee 08 November 2017
None on record
JASON MATTHEWS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/02/2020 02/02/2021 02/02/2022 02/02/2023 02/02/2024
Total gross income £8.40k £31.44k £10.60k £3.60k £24.80k
Total expenditure £18.05k £22.88k £18.00k £5.46k £4.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.10k £10.60k N/A £8.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 February 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2022 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 02 February 2021 13 February 2022 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2021 13 February 2022 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 February 2020 20 December 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Dexter Close
Kennington
Ashford
TN25 4QG
Phone:
01233636644
Website:

No information available