THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF THE COLLEGE OF THE LADY MARGARET IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£17,291,000
Donations and legacies | £5.76m | |
Charitable activities | £9.41m | |
Other trading activities | £831.00k | |
Investments | £1.01m | |
Other | £281.00k |
Total expenditure:
£13,245,000
Raising funds | £1.53m | |
Charitable activities | £11.72m | |
Other | £0 |
£279,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,116,667 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.53m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.72m | |
Retained for future use | £4.05m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.53m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.72m | |
Retained for future use | £4.33m |
People

213 Employee(s)
53 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 06 July 2011: Standard registration
- 20 October 2023: Funds received from 272191 H L JENKYNS CHARITABLE TRUST
- LADY MARGARET HALL (Working name)
- LMH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
53 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hannie Lawlor | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Onyeka Igwe | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Frank Griffel | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Monima Chadha | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shelley McKeown Jones | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guy Westwood | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michail Stamatakis | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joshua Bennett | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roxana Banu | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Bates | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Edward Campbell | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marion Turner | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yujia Qing | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephen James Blyth | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Bashford-Rogers | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin David Robert Higgins | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Denise Van der Kamp | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Xiaowen Dong | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Francis DiTraglia | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Winifred Mullen | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Vanessa Melanie Ferreira | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROF Ana Domingos | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Fraser | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr NATALIE QUINN | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bartholomew Ashton | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROF Varun Kanade | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hanne Eckhoff | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GASCIA OUZOUNIAN | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF Sanja Bogojevic | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kenneth Macdonald | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JILL O'REILLY | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robin Francis Hope Harding | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROF Jan Westerhoff | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Studd | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROF ABDUL AZIZ ABOOBAKER | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ROBERT STEVENS | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr SOPHIE LOUISE RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF GIANLUCA GREGORI | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF PHILIP CHARLES BIGGIN | Trustee | 30 March 2012 |
|
|||||
DR GRANT TAPSELL | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF CHRISTINA GOLDSCHMIDT | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF JOCHEN KOENIGSMANN | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor MICHAEL MONOYIOS | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANN CHILDS | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|||||
Professor BRIAN TODD HUFFMAN | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF LI HE | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor CHRISTINE HERTA GERRARD | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ADRIAN LELAND REES THOMAS | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor CHRISTINA KUHN | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Antony Galione | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID MACDONALD | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor NICHOLAS HANKINS | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARIE-CHANTAL KILLEEN | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.25m | £11.57m | £10.17m | £11.63m | £15.90m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.98m | £11.20m | £10.99m | £14.46m | £13.25m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £369.00k | £495.43k | £24.00k | £1.12m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.10m | £3.13m | £3.69m | £3.75m | £5.76m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.44m | £502.00k | £112.00k | £655.00k | £831.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.11m | £6.82m | £5.77m | £7.74m | £9.41m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £341.00k | £220.00k | £644.00k | £1.40m | £1.39m | |
|
Income - Investment | £901.00k | £939.00k | £728.00k | £824.00k | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Other | £45.00k | £398.00k | £512.00k | £49.00k | £281.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £501.00k | £699.00k | £112.00k | £655.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.37m | £9.97m | £9.93m | £13.10m | £11.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £623.00k | £632.00k | £631.00k | £729.00k | £1.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.00k | £19.00k | £20.00k | £21.00k | £351.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £109.00k | £108.00k | £133.00k | £149.00k | £125.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £987.00k | £589.00k | £428.00k | £629.00k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £34.13m | £33.62m | £31.76m | £29.30m | £29.14m | |
|
Long-term investments | £44.27m | £40.99m | £46.91m | £49.48m | £51.80m | |
|
Other assets | £4.56m | £4.33m | £5.27m | £6.29m | £6.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.41m | -£2.01m | -£1.73m | -£3.94m | -£2.74m | |
|
Total liabilities | £13.99m | £12.46m | £11.22m | £11.10m | £10.78m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 17 MAR 1926 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 31 DEC 1953 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 23 DEC 1960 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 01 JUN 1978 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 07 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR MEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD THE PROTECTION AND TRAINING OF AN ACADEMIC HOUSE, CONDUCTED ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, BUT WITH FULL PROVISION FOR THE LIBERTY OF THOSE WHO ARE NOT MEMBERS OF THAT CHURCH.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LADY MARGARET HALL
NORHAM GARDENS
OXFORD
OX2 6QA
- Phone:
- 01865274322
- Email:
- TREASURER@LMH.OX.AC.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.LMH.OX.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window