Financial history YEITEV LEV ERETZ ISRAEL LTD

Charity Number: 1121260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £322.01k £310.59k £393.09k £603.06k £566.85k
Total expenditure £317.75k £497.22k £405.17k £602.36k £561.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £603.02k £566.70k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £37 £148
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £572.94k £534.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £29.43k £27.41k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.97k £1.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £567.00k £526.23k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0