AMICI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The choir aims to promote, develop and support the wider appreciation of choral music by the development of musical standards, the presentation of public concerts and by offering support and services to other charitable organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA NASH | Chair |
|
||||||
LINDA MARSHALL COLE | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH FULFORD | Trustee | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID VALENTINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Harold Mead | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.96k | £2.66k | £7.55k | £12.54k | £13.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.42k | £4.50k | £4.00k | £11.20k | £14.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE AND DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND WORKSHOPS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSE OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SOMERSET, DEVON, DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Pine Close
Lower Holway
Taunton
TA1 2SD
- Phone:
- 01823286429
- Email:
- amicichoir@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window