ESSEX ASIAN WOMENS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT ASIAN WOMEN IN THE ESSEX COUNTY IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATIONS BY (A) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE BREAKDOWN OF BARRIERS TO EMPLOYMENT. (B) HEALTH AWARENESS, EXERCISE CLASSES, SOCIAL CARE FACILITIES AND SUPPORT FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE VICTIMS. (C) THE PROVISION OF CHARITABLE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE, WHICH DIRECTLY RELIEVES THE NEED OF BENEFICIARES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 07 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIRMAL GUPTA MBE | Chair |
|
||||||
MRS VEENA SOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHIV CHARAN VARMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.43k | £3.39k | £11.67k | £6.33k | £10.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.37k | £3.99k | £7.20k | £8.86k | £15.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: THE RELIEF OF ASIAN WOMEN IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE BREAKING DOWN OF BARRIERS TO EMPLOYMENT (B) THE DEVELOPMENT OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE FACILITIES APPROPRIATE TO THE NEEDS OF ASIAN WOMEN INCLUDING SUPPORT FOR THOSE SUFFERING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (C) THE PROVISION OF CHARITABLE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE, WHICH DIRECTLY RELIEVES THE NEEDS OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 APPLEDORE
SHOEBURYNESS
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS3 8UW
- Phone:
- 01702584959
- Email:
- nirmalgupta1@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window