Financial history CHILDREN'S ACUTE TRANSPORT SERVICE

Charity Number: 1124897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.28k £12.86k £30.04k £83.96k £38.25k
Total expenditure £104.55k £11.33k £29.14k £39.49k £38.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A