AMBULANCE RESPONDER TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the preservation and protection of good health within the UK by provision of trained first response volunteers, to attend medical emergencies as directed by South east Coast Ambulance service To advance the education of the public in first aid in particular, but not exclusively, by the provision of training in the principles and practice of first aid
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 17 January 2008: Standard registration
- 20 March 2023: Funds received from 1080358 SEAFORD STROKE AND CARING CLUB
- AREST (Working name)
- SEAHAVEN RESPONDERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACK EDWARD CHARLES STONEHOUSE | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Morris | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Ring | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.65k | £17.13k | £6.17k | £4.71k | £5.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.77k | £5.57k | £16.75k | £5.16k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH WITHIN THE UK BY PROVISION OF TRAINED FIRST RESPONSE VOLUNTEERS, TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES AS DIRECTED BY SOUTH EAST COAST AMBULANCE SERVICE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN FIRST AID IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF FIRST AID.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 North Way
SEAFORD
BN25 3HP
- Phone:
- 07871302060
- Email:
- info@seahavenresponders.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window