Financial history MILTON KEYNES DONS FOOTBALL CLUB SPORTS & EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1123762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £950.87k £1.06m £1.38m £1.45m £1.67m
Total expenditure £953.31k £871.14k £1.29m £1.53m £1.66m
Income from government contracts £16.50k N/A N/A £12.00k £50.66k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £150.68k
Income - Donations and legacies £188.62k £219.12k £309.98k £285.20k £401.72k
Income - Other trading activities £6.31k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £671.55k £724.62k £1.06m £1.16m £1.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £84.39k £113.12k £4.34k £544 £1.77k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £953.31k £871.14k £1.29m £1.53m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.54k £0 £0 £0 £20.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0