PLYMOUTH UNITARIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our core activity is a regular Sunday service, in the church, for worship and celebration. We also have discussion groups and action groups meeting on weekdays, e.g. a Green Group, a Poetry Group and other discussion groups. We support other chosen charities by fund-raising, and liaise with other faith and inter-faith groups, with the aim of promoting inter-faith communication and harmony.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 14 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN FLORENCE KADER | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|||||
LINDA ANN SUMMERSON | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Marianne Evelyn Elizabeth PRIEST | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA VIOLET EVANS | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.02k | £55.22k | £58.64k | £58.98k | £61.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.87k | £49.20k | £55.91k | £51.32k | £58.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £510 | N/A | £300 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.93k | £3.87k | £1.50k | £1.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 March 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 March 2024 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AS STATED IN ITS HANDBOOK WHICH IS ISSUED PERIODICALLY TO MEMBER CONGREGATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE PLYMOUTH
Linked charities
- 14 May 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
PLYMOUTH UNITARIAN CHURCH
NOTTE STREET
PLYMOUTH
PL1 2HG
- Phone:
- 01752292720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window