Financial history WEALDSTONE YOUTH FC (RUISLIP)

Charity number: 1124918
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £70.54k £72.21k £119.67k £145.88k £180.07k
Total expenditure £73.88k £53.63k £101.93k £137.60k £188.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A