WEALDSTONE YOUTH FC (RUISLIP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN RUISLIP IN THE BOROUGH OF hILLINGDON UP TO THE AGE OF 18 BY COACHING IN AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE GAME OF FOOTBALL SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 09 July 2008: Standard registration
- RUISLIP MANOR YOUTH FC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Chorlton | Chair | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Reen | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Dargue | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN DARGUE | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Jason Hunter | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ronnie Welch | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.83k | £70.54k | £72.21k | £119.67k | £145.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.74k | £73.88k | £53.63k | £101.93k | £137.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/2013
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN RUISLIP UP TO THE AGE OF 18 BY COACHING IN AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE GAME OF FOOTBALL SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY 2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL
Area of benefit
RUISLIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 West End Road
RUISLIP
HA4 6JS
- Phone:
- 07989 514830
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window