LINDEN STREET EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Islamic prayer service After school children's facility to learn islamic tenets
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
Governance
- 21 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMAR FARUQUE ESSAT | Trustee |
|
||||||||
OSMAN VALLI MAHOMED | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MUSA AHMED SALEH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ISMAIL MUSA UMAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.16k | £101.79k | £30.24k | £70.13k | £59.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.91k | £47.44k | £49.29k | £80.77k | £57.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") I) 10 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY LEARNING PROGRAMMES, CLASSES, SEMINARS AND FUNCTIONS; II) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SUNNI HANAFI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP, AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION,; MI) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; IV)TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF MUSLIMS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LEICESTER CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LINDENS
LINDEN STREET
LEICESTER
LE5 5EE
- Phone:
- 07512189995
- Email:
- amknoorani@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window