Trustees BURRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1124060

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Woodward | Chair | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Stocks | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Gill | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Stewart Wallace | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sara Isobel Wallace | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Woods | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Lever | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paige Saunders | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Martin | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Aspinell | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Burton | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.