Financial history M25 CONSORTIUM OF ACADEMIC LIBRARIES

Charity number: 1130877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £204.82k £157.36k £141.65k £144.46k £140.76k
Total expenditure £267.67k £187.95k £146.00k £125.23k £94.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A