Accounts and annual returns FUN4KIDS

Charity number: 1125178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 13 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required