TIFFINIAN ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have continued maintaining and developing the Old Tiffinian Sports Ground at East Molesey for use by Tiffin School and the community, and have made grants to support the School and its students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Lester | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|||||
TOBY BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK WILLIAM DARBY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.15k | £79.87k | £134.87k | £174.19k | £210.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.38k | £62.33k | £87.14k | £141.74k | £232.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FOLLOWING: . FORMER AND PRESENT PUPILS OF TIFFIN SCHOOL, KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES AND THEIR FAMILIES . EMPLOYEES OF TIFFIN SCHOOL AND THEIR FAMILIES . OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH TIFFIN SCHOOL; AND . THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES AND ITS ENVIRONS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS THE CHARITY MAY DECIDE 2 TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT TIFFIN SCHOOL BY THE AWARD OF GRANTS, IN CONSULTATION WITH TIFFIN SCHOOL, TO PUPILS WHO, BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO FULLY PARTICIPATE IN EDUCATIONAL OR SPORTING ACTIVITIES WHETHER WITHIN OR OUTSIDE THE CURRICULUM OFFERED BY THE TIFFIN SCHOOL 3 TO FURTHER EXCELLENCE IN ACADEMIC STUDIES, THE PERFORMING ARTS, SPORT AND CITIZENSHIP BY PROMOTING THE AWARD OF PRIZES FOR EFFORT AND ACHIEVEMENT TO PUPILS OF TIFFIN SCHOOL, IN CONSULTATION WITH TIFFIN SCHOOL 4 TO FURTHER EDUCATION AND CITIZENSHIP BY MAKING GRANTS WHICH ENABLE TIFFIN SCHOOL TO: . ENHANCE ITS EDUCATIONAL AND SPORTING FACILITIES . MAKE ITS FACILITIES, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND KNOW-HOW AVAILABLE TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY . ENTER INTO PARTNERSHIPS WITH OTHER SCHOOLS, FURTHER EDUCATION COLLEGES AND OTHER BODIES, INCLUDING SPONSORING AWARDS AND COMPETITIONS . PROVIDE HOLIDAY COURSES AND EXCHANGE PROGRAMMES OPEN TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tiffin School
Queen Elizabeth Road
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT2 6RL
- Phone:
- 020 8546 4638
- Email:
- tal@tiffin.kingston.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window