Financial history SHREWSBURY TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1125101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.39m £1.91m £2.03m £1.80m £1.53m
Total expenditure £1.23m £1.56m £1.97m £1.63m £1.48m
Income from government contracts £104.02k £181.01k £165.51k £47.84k £47.48k
Income from government grants £67.21k £33.85k £211.00k £135.26k £234.44k
Income - Donations and legacies £336.42k £706.31k £473.71k £0 £692.09k
Income - Other trading activities £18.00k £12.93k £18.49k £0 £16.32k
Income - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.19m £1.54m £1.78m £819.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £366 £75 £17 £706 £1.68k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £15.46k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £1.56m £1.97m £1.63m £1.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.08k £6.35k £6.87k £8.80k £9.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0