TOGETHER FOR PEACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Together for Peace (T4P) is a Leeds-based charity working to develop and support cooperative projects that strengthen communities and promote peace-making.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £47,409 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 23 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Clare Langdana | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saiqa Sharif | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Thomas Harwood Carlisle | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mackay Phelps | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Love | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Olivier Nkunzimana | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Holding | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.29k | £57.18k | £163.18k | £337.30k | £458.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.84k | £86.84k | £144.37k | £250.01k | £426.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £17.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £47.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 December 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/10/2013
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY IN THE CITY OF LEEDS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (FOR EXAMPLE) A PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS B ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS C WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN AND PROMOTE PEACE BUILDING AND CONFLICT TRANSFORMATION IN THE CITY OF LEEDS 3 TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE CITY OF LEEDS THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS OF THE FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND PROMOTING AND ENABLING COLLABORATIVE RESPONSES AND SOLUTIONS TO MITIGATE THESE
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
145A CARDIGAN ROAD
LEEDS
LS6 1LJ
- Phone:
- 07738 921 277
- Email:
- hello@t4p.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window