BEDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1127177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of hall for use by the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £45,318
Total expenditure: £49,111

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BEDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
rosalyn townsend Trustee
WALLINGTON DIVISION OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BEVERLEY ANN SHEW Trustee
CARSHALTON & DISTRICT HISTORY & ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY
Received: On time
NICK GEER Trustee
None on record
GEMMA LOUISE TOWNSEND Trustee
None on record
HELEN ELLIOTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.73k £15.27k £44.42k £38.68k £45.32k
Total expenditure £38.56k £21.38k £44.02k £39.76k £49.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Beddington Village Hall
1-5 Beddington Lane
CROYDON
CR0 4TG
Phone:
02083950300