Financial history THE REVEREND DR THOMAS WHITE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1125421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £122.14k £113.50k £124.64k £130.94k £138.20k
Total expenditure £68.65k £82.38k £95.74k £93.78k £137.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A