ACACIA PARTNERSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is involved in activities in Burkina Faso in line with its objectives, specifically by building and running a school, sponsoring children through high school education, well drilling, evangelism and training, supporting local church pastors, and setting up a mobile dental clinic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- Burkina Faso
Governance
- 12 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH MARY HOMER | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Paul Douglas Tarrant | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Tainsh | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY ROBERT MORRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr PAUL STEPHEN KIRKWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.13k | £147.26k | £90.31k | £88.36k | £103.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.35k | £97.36k | £120.22k | £130.92k | £72.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 08 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BURKINA FASO IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
BURKINA FASO
Contact information
- Address:
-
129 Mains Drive
ERSKINE
Renfrewshire
PA8 7JJ
- Phone:
- 07947834267
- Email:
- finance@aptburkina.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window