ASPIRE SPORTS AND CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 1125995
Charity is insolvent

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide or assist in the provision of facilities and services for recreational, sporting or other leisure pursuits in the interests of social welfare. To develop and support education, culture, arts, heritage and history and other related services, promoting community participation in healthy recreation. To promote the benefits of active lifestyle and physical activity targetting young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Susan Castle Trustee 10 August 2021
None on record
Karen Dawe Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Christopher John Rawlins Trustee 14 January 2019
None on record
Paul Geoffrey Toleman Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Gerald Robin Weston Bown Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Neil Hampson Trustee 03 August 2015
GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY NURSES FOUNDATION CIO
Recently registered
Mr Martyn White Trustee 29 January 2014
GLOUCESTER HISTORIC BUILDINGS LIMITED
Received: On time
LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY TRUST
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER CIVIC TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTER CHARITIES TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.27m £2.95m £2.84m £1.19m £2.13m
Total expenditure £3.33m £3.32m £3.82m £1.55m £2.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £257.51k N/A N/A £801.87k £82.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £55.53k £46.29k £49.69k £262.84k £179.74k
Income - Charitable activities £3.21m £2.90m £2.78m £382.98k £1.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.25k £4.37k £4.07k £256 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £546.31k £82.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.27m £3.28m £3.80m £1.54m £2.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £44.67k £37.16k £20.83k £3.45k £7.36k
Expenditure - Governance £23.69k £58.64k £33.81k £15.60k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £23.69k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Own use assets £127.74k £363.21k £289.38k £208.60k £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £168.39k
Other assets £1.51m £1.27m £634.42k £435.11k £395.41k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 -£330.00k £0 -£238.00k £0
Total liabilities £418.70k £662.38k £771.14k £791.18k £979.98k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CROWE UK LLP
JARVIS HOUSE
4 MOUNT EPHRAIM ROAD
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN1 1EE
Phone:
01892 700 200
Website:

WWW.CROWE.CO.UK