Financial history KIDZ KLUB BRIGHTON & HOVE

Charity Number: 1126869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £116.91k £129.73k £149.51k £194.53k £179.65k
Total expenditure £99.70k £131.73k £180.70k £191.15k £187.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A