Financial history THE MERCHANT TAYLORS' SCHOOLS CROSBY

Charity Number: 1125485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.91m £14.99m £15.79m £16.72m £15.90m
Total expenditure £16.44m £14.67m £16.11m £16.36m £16.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £234.94k £60.89k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £326.63k £40.00k £96.04k £462.65k £489.15k
Income - Other trading activities £100.17k £133.00k £145.14k £155.59k £144.85k
Income - Charitable activities £15.23m £14.05m £15.15m £15.69m £14.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £40.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £307.64k £349.26k £349.33k £306.14k
Income - Other £259.69k £459.63k £45.92k £65.34k £86.29k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £5.00k £105.37k £300.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.27m £14.55m £15.95m £16.19m £16.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £165.97k £75.84k £86.74k £96.46k £116.69k
Expenditure - Governance £119.34k £90.13k £62.67k £54.03k £51.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £50.09k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £41.14k £74.07k £69.47k £101.90k