Financial history THE ARTS SOCIETY CHARNWOOD

Charity number: 1126720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.49k £3.03k £7.09k £6.02k £7.79k
Total expenditure £7.94k £4.94k £8.87k £7.93k £6.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A