GREATER LAMAKAZI WELFARE ASSOCIATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Advancing education and training; providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupation. 2. Relieving people in Bangladesh and in the UK who are living in poverty, sickness and distress through the provision welfare, employment, health, education, immigration and other matters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 26 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SADEQUZ ZAMAN | Chair | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUTHFUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Heron Miah | Trustee |
|
||||||
FARUQUE ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SHAHA NUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWLATH KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85k | £638 | £580 | £1.45k | £612 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £1.29k | £300 | £1.97k | £292 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 19 December 2022 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 19 December 2022 | 445 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE IN THE UK AND THE GREATER LAMAKAZI AREA OF BANGLADESH BY A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
THE UK AND THE GREATER LAMAKAZI AREA OF BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 Barnmead Road
DAGENHAM
RM9 5DX
- Phone:
- 02074239969
- Email:
- admin@glwa.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window