CAIUS HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TABLE TENNIS ARTS COOKERY DANCE POOL AND SNOOKER FOOTBALL BOXING MARTIAL ARTS DRAMA BASKETBALL MUSIC STUDIO DAY EXCURSIONS LIFE SKILLS COMPUTING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £18,670 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 10 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Edward Nettlefold | Chair | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simone Allen | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Virgo | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Morris | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHNNY COLVILLE | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CALLY HAMMOND REVD DR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.40k | £430.33k | £542.80k | £487.06k | £493.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £432.40k | £482.81k | £582.59k | £532.79k | £548.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.21k | £31.58k | £52.30k | £39.64k | £18.67k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £183.77k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £322.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £37.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £535.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £46.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
3.1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3.3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY OUTREACH SERVICES. 3.4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MUSIC AND DRAMA.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caius House
2 Holman Road
London
SW11 3RL
- Phone:
- 02038186210
- Email:
- info@caiushouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window