Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ROMSEY ABBEY

Charity number: 1134191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.54k £12.50k £21.75k £10.56k £16.44k
Total expenditure £10.63k £9.31k £16.75k £13.31k £32.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A