Financial history UNIVERSITY OF DERBY THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1129005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.28m £3.38m £3.36m £5.07m £4.22m
Total expenditure £4.29m £3.40m £4.62m £4.82m £5.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £809.63k N/A £333.74k £1.43m £863.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.84m £0 £1.97m £3.02m £1.62m
Income - Other trading activities £221.78k £0 £162.30k £207.09k £262.20k
Income - Charitable activities £1.96m £2.79m £1.52m £1.79m £2.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.56k £226.00k £7.38k £64.38k £96.60k
Income - Other £252.04k £356.38k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.05m £3.40m £4.35m £4.46m £4.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £58.10k £359.53k £474.72k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £34.42k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.24m £0 £219.13k £0 £0