ACADEMY FM FOLKESTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF FOLKESTONE ACADEMY STUDENTS (& SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME) & INHABITANTS OF FOLKESTONE AREA IN COMMUNICATION, BROADCASTING & OTHER MEDIA SKILLS & TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND CITIZENSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF FOLKESTONE & SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY RADIO STATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 04 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katy Tibbles | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Wilson | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA NOLAN CEO | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.48k | £100.46k | £131.06k | £80.84k | £47.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.44k | £100.28k | £117.30k | £122.49k | £62.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.50k | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 23 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS OF THE FOLKESTONE ACADEMY (AND SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME) AND THE INHABITANTS OF FOLKESTONE AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN RADIO COMMUNICATION, PRODUCTION AND BROADCASTING AND OTHER MEDIA SKILLS; AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH RADIO BROADCASTS ON SUCH TOPICS THAT FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE CURRENTLY RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE AND ANY NEW CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
FOLKESTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Folkestone Academy
Academy Lane
FOLKESTONE
Kent
CT19 5FP
- Phone:
- 01303 842400
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window