KATHRYN'S MERCY HOME TRUST (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All activities in India. Providing hostel facilities to enable children to attend local schools, colleges and other educational institutions. Running a local kindergarten and primary school. Providing hostel facilities for unsupported elderly women. Providing teachers to rural communities; providing free computer and tailoring coursesand medical camps.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 21 May 2009: Standard registration
- KMH(UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Catherine O'Callaghan | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Hazel Ann Cook | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|||||||
Rev WILLIAM ALAN JOHN ALLBERRY | Trustee | 27 April 2009 |
|
|
||||||
KATHRYN ALISON FLENLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev IAN HOWARTH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.51k | £71.04k | £62.66k | £57.52k | £90.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.87k | £60.07k | £42.16k | £91.69k | £70.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 27 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
* THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF POOR CHILDREN LIVING IN THE REGION OF DEVAKOTTAI, TAMIL NADU, SOUTH INDIA BY PROVIDING HOSTEL FACILITIES, FOOD, CLOTHING AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS SO THAT THEY CAN ATTEND LOCAL SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AT ALL LEVELS * THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE REGION BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS AND SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS * THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN THE REGION EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS, FACILITIES OR SERVICES * THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE REGION WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED HOUSING, AND ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS, AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST SUCH ELDERLY PEOPLE * THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE REGION IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR MEDICAL, SOCIAL AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY * THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR WORK SKILLS, PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE REGIONNN
Area of benefit
DEVAKOTTAI, TAMIL NADU, SOUTH INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Ditton Road
SURBITON
KT6 6RB
- Phone:
- 07818 641576
- Email:
- kmhuk88@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window