THE LOCOMOTIVE CONSERVATION AND LEARNING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to advance education and learning and to promote public benefit through the preservation, restoration, maintenance and exhibition of steam railway locomotives and other railway artefacts, establishing a facility for the safe-keeping and exhibition of them and the provision of information and education about the history of such locomotives and other railway artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 May 2009: Standard registration
- 30 September 2022: Funds received from 1006841 9F LOCOMOTIVE CHARITABLE TRUST COMPANY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN PETER CHARLES BIRLEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Toby Watkins | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MIKE THOMPSON | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JARMAN BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.64k | £20.95k | £231.99k | £264.46k | £136.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.61k | £481.43k | £259.49k | £154.56k | £208.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 191 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2024 | 556 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2024 | 556 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEARNING AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION,' MAINTENANCE AND EXHIBITION OF STEAM RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES AND OTHER RAILWAY ARTEFACTS, ESTABLISHING A FACILITY FOR THE SAFE-KEEPING AND EXHIBITION OF THEM AND THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND EDUCATION ABOUT THE HISTORY OF SUCH LOCOMOTIVES AND OTHER RAILWAY ARTEFACTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stone Flagged Cottage
Newbiggin
LEYBURN
North Yorkshire
DL8 3TD
- Phone:
- 07792556919
- Email:
- info@lclt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window