Accounts and annual returns GABAI TZEDOKOH LIMITED

Charity number: 1129844
Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 805 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 805 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 April 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required