THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF THE MANCHESTER ACADEMY AND HARRIS COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activity of the College, as specified in the Royal Charter is the teaching of undergraduate and postgraduate mature students of the University of Oxford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£5,618,000
Donations and legacies | £1.85m | |
Charitable activities | £2.77m | |
Other trading activities | £2.00k | |
Investments | £804.00k | |
Other | £188.00k |
Total expenditure:
£5,269,000
Raising funds | £122.00k | |
Charitable activities | £5.15m | |
Other | £0 |
-£806,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £122.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.15m | |
Retained for future use | £349.00k |
People

64 Employee(s)
28 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- HARRIS MANCHESTER COLLEGE (Working name)
- HARRIS MANCHESTER COLLEGE, OXFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Aziz Ul Haque Sheikh | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Klassen | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Harris | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Philip Manning | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Dr Claire MacDonald | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew Weait | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley James Walters | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Alderson-Smith | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Harrison Callum Bertram Steel | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isabel Ruiz Olaya | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Linda Hulin | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hayley Jayne Hooper | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Mary Jackson | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jane Shaw | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gina Hadley | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Vella | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JAN-EMMANUEL DE NEVE | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CATHERINE MCLOUGHLIN | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr KRISTIN VAN ZWIETEN | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr RONALD ROY | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOSHUA HORDERN | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA LILL | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN FIDLER | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALEX NICHOLLS | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MANDER | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BEE LENG WEE | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRIK RORSMAN | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE HUDSON | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19m | £3.32m | £4.85m | £6.58m | £5.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.30m | £4.19m | £4.41m | £5.07m | £5.27m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £390.31k | £47.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.58m | £929.00k | £2.30m | £4.24m | £1.85m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £7.93k | £2.00k | £4.00k | £2.94k | £2.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.10m | £1.74m | £1.72m | £2.51m | £2.77m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £820.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £508.67k | £463.00k | £601.00k | £615.59k | £804.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £182.00k | £228.00k | £28.22k | £188.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £44.23k | £1.76m | £36.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.24m | £4.07m | £4.22m | £4.97m | £5.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £60.51k | £122.00k | £184.00k | £99.00k | £122.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.00k | £108.00k | £93.00k | £18.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £9.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £8.54k | £6.00k | £9.00k | £5.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £25.92m | £25.47m | £24.88m | £24.35m | £23.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £14.79m | £14.37m | £16.74m | £17.35m | £17.96m | |
|
Other assets | £2.61m | £1.73m | £2.93m | £5.22m | £4.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£465.37k | -£374.00k | -£348.00k | -£694.73k | -£627.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.27m | £889.00k | £1.10m | £985.46k | £1.25m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER OF 23 NOVEMBER 1995 STATUTES LAST AMENDED 2011
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE LEARNING, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES WITHIN THE UNIVERSITY AND; B) TO PROVIDE FOR MEN AND WOMEN WHO SHALL BE MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY AND FROM WHOM NO TEST OF CONFESSION OF FAITH WILL BE REQUIRED I) A COLLEGE IN WHICH THEY MAY WORK FOR DEGREES, DIPLOMAS AND CERTIFICATES OF THE UNIVERSITY FOR THE PURPOSE OF THEIR ENGAGING IN ADVANCED AND OTHER STUDY AND THE CONDUCT AND PUBLICATION OF RESEARCH; AND II) PREPATORY INSTRUCTION FOR THE LEARNED PROFESSIONALS AND FOR CIVIL AND COMMERCIAL LIFE; AND III) A FULL AND SYSTEMATIC COURSE OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING MINISTERS OF RELIGION, HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY TO THE MINISTRIES OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES IN OUR UNITED KINGDOM AND OF THE NON-SUBSCRIBING PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF IRELAND. C) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ITS SIMPLEST AND MOST INTELLIGIBLE FORM, AND IN PARTICULAR THE TRADITIONS ORIGINATING IN ENGLISH RATIONAL DISSENT.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARRIS MANCHESTER COLLEGE
MANSFIELD ROAD
OXFORD
OX1 3TD
- Phone:
- 01865 271006
- Email:
- enquiries@hmc.ox.ac.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.HMC.OX.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window