EAGLES WINGS MINISTRIES UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1132628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £12,526
Total expenditure: £8,852

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Philippines
  • Rwanda
  • South Africa
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Eden Ricketts Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Colin Parkes Trustee 11 June 2021
None on record
Pauline Joan Neels Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record
Paul Edward White Trustee 27 October 2018
None on record
Ian Walton Trustee 01 February 2014
THE LANTERN TRUST (WEYMOUTH)
Received: On time
THE LANTERN TRUST WEYMOUTH
Received: On time
MARGARET MOORE Trustee 24 February 2012
None on record
Dr MARY BENNETT Trustee 25 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £19.82k £26.91k £16.94k £13.72k £12.53k
Total expenditure £18.49k £19.20k £23.22k £16.34k £8.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 3
5 Widcombe Street
Poundbury
Dorchester
DT1 3BS
Phone:
013055250811
Email:
No information available