CONGRESS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Congress Theatre objectives are: to provide, maintain, improve and advance education of the public in the arts and sciences; in particular the art and science of Theatre by presentation of public performances and other similar activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £41,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Torfaen
Governance
- 13 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Keech | Chair | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Cox | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Brimble | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kirsten Tuck | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Malcolm Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Pippen | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
COUNCILLOR STEWART MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
STEPHEN JOHN BROOKS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BERNARD JOHN CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REVEREND HARALD THOMAS MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.54k | £200.05k | £173.45k | £190.31k | £196.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.76k | £167.31k | £191.94k | £188.02k | £189.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.50k | £168.00k | £41.00k | £41.00k | £41.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES; IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF THE THEATRE BY PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND OTHER SIMILAR ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CONGRESS THEATRE CO
50 GWENT SQUARE
CWMBRAN
NP44 1PL
- Phone:
- 01633868239
- Email:
- info@congresstheatre.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window