SENSES (SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS; SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SENSES supports families of pre-school children with additional learning, physical or medical needs in Scarborough and the surrounding area. Qualified and experienced staff run two weekly toddler groups, one in central Scarborough and one in Eastfield. Both provide multi-sensory experiences as well as the opportunity for parent-to-parent supportive relationships to develop.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 September 2009: Standard registration
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 February 2015: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND BLYTH | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret BLYTH | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GURNEY | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND GRAEME DAVID PARKINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JENNIFER ANNE PARKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.13k | £11.87k | £18.62k | £23.90k | £26.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £10.62k | £17.84k | £22.23k | £25.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN WITH ANY FORM OF DISABILITY BY THE PROVISION OF A MULTI SENSORY ENVIRONMENT WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2.2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED CHILDREN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR THE CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
OASIS FAMILY CENTRE
ELIM PENTECOSTAL CHURCH
SCARBOROUGH CHRISTIAN CENTRE
CASTLE ROAD
SCARBOROUGH
YO11 1XE
- Phone:
- 01723368831
- Website:
-
sensesinscarborough.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window