Financial history THE FOOTBALL LEAGUE (COMMUNITY) LIMITED

Charity number: 1132689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.57m £21.73m £25.99m £12.32m £12.86m
Total expenditure £19.34m £20.14m £25.12m £13.04m £13.35m
Income from government contracts £11.91m £14.60m £18.16m £5.57m £768.16k
Income from government grants £128.57k £1.41m £1.09m £873.64k £2.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £5.13m £6.41m £6.30m £4.36m £2.80m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £100.00k £261.10k £322.08k
Income - Charitable activities £13.42m £15.32m £19.59m £7.58m £9.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.56k £4.72k £4.76k £121.23k £278.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.34m £20.14m £25.05m £12.87m £13.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.82k £20 £63.68k £173.99k £212.55k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £35.61k £0 £6.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £20.88m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0