WEB SCIENCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the education of the public in the subject of Web Science; lead the development of a research agenda and curricula in the Web Science community worldwide; provide support for activities such as conferences; support the creation of academic publication venues; engage government and private sector sources of science funding internationally; develop a global network of premier research labs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Southampton City
Governance
- 11 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JP RANGASWAMI | Chair | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
William Thompson | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Zhu Scott | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Steffen Staab | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Ann Rowland-Campbell | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR GEORGE METAKIDES | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR NOSHIR SAROSH CONTRACTOR | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR WENDY HALL CBE FRENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROF SIR NIGEL SHADBOLT FRS FREng | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR JAMES ALEXANDER HENDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.81k | £41.30k | £49.78k | £55.67k | £34.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.11k | £51.01k | £38.01k | £42.66k | £49.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF WEB SCIENCE AND IN PARTICULAR; A PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE DISCIPLINE OF WEB SCIENCE BY LEADING THE DEVELOPMENT OF A RESEARCH AGENDA AND ROADMAP IN THE EMERGING WEB SCIENCE COMMUNITY WORLDWIDE; B PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF WEB SCIENCE CURRICULA AT ALL RELEVANT EDUCATIONAL LEVELS AROUND THE WORLD; C PROVIDE ORGANIZATIONAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR ACTIVITIES SUCH AS CONFERENCES, WORKSHOPS AND SYMPOSIA AROUND THE WORLD ON TOPICS IN WEB SCIENCE; 4 SUPPORT THE CREATION OF ACADEMIC PUBLICATION VENUES NEEDED TO ENABLE SCHOLARLY COMMUNICATION IN THE GLOBAL WEB SCIENCE COMMUNITY; 5 ENGAGE GOVERNMENT AND PRIVATE SECTOR SOURCES OF SCIENCE FUNDING INTERNATIONALLY TO COLLABORATE IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR WEB SCIENCE RESEARCH IN EDUCATION IN PREMIER RESEARCH AND TEACHING INSTITUTIONS; AND 6 PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF A GLOBAL NETWORK OF PREMIER WEB SCIENCE RESEARCH LABS UNDER THE WEB SCIENCE TRUST AEGIS, BY ESTABLISHING LEGAL AND FINANCIAL COLLABORATIONS WITH RESEARCH INSTITUTIONS INCLUDING LEADING UNIVERSITIES WHO WISH TO CO-OPERATE ON THE DEVELOPMENT OF WEB SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Russell House
Oxford Road
Bournemouth
England
BH8 8EX
- Phone:
- 023 8059 3523
- Email:
- info@webscience.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window