Financial history CLARE HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.87m £3.13m £4.58m £5.03m £6.13m
Total expenditure £4.30m £3.74m £4.35m £5.12m £5.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £361.32k £219.59k £778.43k £573.15k £1.29m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.43m £1.72m £2.67m £3.22m £3.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £22.50k £0 £333.64k
Income - Investment £1.08m £1.10m £1.13m £1.24m £1.41m
Income - Other £0 £88.57k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £201.08k £257.65k £56.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.02m £3.49m £4.08m £4.87m £4.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £244.14k £200.60k £92.85k £111.59k £169.03k
Expenditure - Governance £11.00k £12.50k £15.12k £18.90k £20.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £35.88k £45.12k £180.74k £138.07k £47.83k