Financial history HUGHES HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity Number: 1137471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.84m £9.51m £12.93m £14.26m £17.07m
Total expenditure £7.63m £7.27m £9.56m £11.18m £12.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.84m £3.02m £4.99m £1.87m £1.45m
Income - Other trading activities £384.57k £6.33k £315.76k £669.38k £1.12m
Income - Charitable activities £5.95m £6.02m £7.13m £7.49m £8.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £1.05m £50.00k £128.61k
Income - Investment £387.30k £267.66k £341.42k £1.20m £1.95m
Income - Other £267.81k £190.91k £155.43k £3.04m £4.26m
Income - Legacies £0 £74.55k £153.23k £100.00k £469.22k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.41m £6.02m £7.85m £7.86m £8.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £667.35k £351.05k £606.08k £972.89k £1.34m
Expenditure - Governance £37.31k £50.63k £56.43k £64.64k £85.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £712.00k £752.13k
Expenditure - Investment management £74.22k £84.81k £91.33k £101.06k £123.65k
Expenditure - Other £549.36k £893.63k £1.09m £2.34m £2.83m