UNITY WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UWF strives to help the poor, especially women, to overcome the suffering and lack of life's basic necessities and skills. Currently it has the following projects in Bangladesh: Grants for Income generation products such as rickshaw, cow, sewing machine veg stall etc. Provide sustainable livelihoods for widows who have no support. UWF is aiming to provide soup kitchen and help to homeless.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
- Bangladesh
- India
- Somalia
Governance
- 30 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAH MUHAMMED ANAS | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
MOHAMMED MOINUL HAQUE CHOUDHURY | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
MOHAMMED AZIZUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
MUHAMMED SHAYESTA MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SAIFUL ALOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MOHAMMED INHAM UDDIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
HUSSAIN AHMED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.89k | £111.56k | £173.63k | £187.55k | £160.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.58k | £145.89k | £99.49k | £116.60k | £119.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED 31 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY (OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 WHITWELL RD
PLAISTOW
LONDON
E13 8BP
- Phone:
- 07852966357
- Email:
- unitywf@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window