BRIGHTER START

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brighter Start raises funds in the UK to help charities, groups and individuals in sub-Saharan Africa to improve education for young people under 25, and to relieve poverty or financial hardship to enable young people to benefit from education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Malawi
- South Africa
Governance
- 20 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON THOMAS MURDOCH | Chair |
|
||||||
ANDREW GWYNNE ASHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCESCA JANE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIELLE CAROLINE MURDOCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.53k | £8.11k | £19.98k | £12.58k | £22.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.94k | £13.00k | £17.03k | £16.52k | £12.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 4 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY, GROUP, ORGANISATION OR INDIVIDUALS IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BECOME SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO BENEFIT FROM THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, OR TO CHARITIES, OR TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Area of benefit
SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bramshott Chase House
Bramshott Chase Lane
Bramshott Chase
Hindhead
GU26 6DG
- Phone:
- 01428605553
- Email:
- info@brighterstart.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window