Financial history THE KANAMAI DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 1135759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £100.82k £100.77k £113.90k £149.00k £153.41k
Total expenditure £109.69k £108.85k £111.32k £140.15k £155.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A