Financial history MAECENAS

Charity number: 1132363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £661.33k £398.53k £245.82k £115.22k £94.41k
Total expenditure £676.70k £291.20k £281.34k £209.42k £72.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £598.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £62.64k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £111 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £676.70k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £66.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £610.22k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A