THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1132208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the church and and non members alike. The teaching of Christianity through sermons etc, Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and services. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through activities generally and for other specific needs groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 22 June 2012: Funds received from 525690 THE BARHAM SCHOOL
  • 30 November 2018: Funds received from 1118848 THE CHURCHES' AGENCY FOR SAFEGUARDING
  • 30 October 2024: Funds received from 1195639 BESTWOOD PARK CHURCH COMMUNITY PROJECTS
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard Byass Trustee 01 September 2024
Nottingham North East Circuit of the Methodist Church
Received: On time
PAUL SPRAY Trustee 01 September 2024
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
KEITH HICKEY Trustee 01 September 2024
METHODIST HOMES
Received: On time
Revd Dr Michael Long Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Beverley Hollings Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Dawn Wood Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Revd Dr Joanne Cox-Darling Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Professor David Matthews Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Nicholas Oborski Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
ALETHEA SIOW Trustee 30 June 2024
None on record
Rev Timothy Swindell Trustee 30 June 2024
None on record
Carolyn Godfrey Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Rev Sarah Parkin Trustee 13 June 2023
BRAMHALL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev David Goodall Trustee 13 June 2023
THE METHODIST CHURCH YORKSHIRE WEST DISTRICT
Received: 103 days late
Rev Sonia Marcia Hicks Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev Helen D Cameron Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
The Revd Dr Jonathan Richard Hustler Trustee 02 July 2018
TRUSTEES FOR METHODIST CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
REV GILL NEWTON Trustee 01 September 2014
CENTRAL METHODIST CHURCH CHESTERFIELD
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
ANNA MARGARET MALNUTT Trustee 01 September 2014
WORTH: WOMEN ON THE ROAD TO HEALING
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £49.15m £44.36m £40.28m £56.23m £52.98m
Total expenditure £49.64m £44.35m £39.36m £46.84m £51.94m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £681.00k £979.00k £31.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.16m £9.56m £6.70m £15.68m £6.48m
Income - Other trading activities £9.58m £6.05m £2.09m £5.95m £9.37m
Income - Charitable activities £13.94m £13.90m £13.99m £13.87m £13.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.82m £5.41m £4.85m £6.14m £6.04m
Income - Other £7.65m £9.45m £12.66m £14.59m £17.56m
Income - Legacies £3.39m £4.11m £2.05m £2.51m £1.72m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £41.26m £37.18m £35.39m £41.17m £43.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.38m £7.18m £3.97m £5.67m £8.02m
Expenditure - Governance £3.07m £4.55m £4.24m £4.86m £5.19m
Expenditure - Grants institution £16.18m £9.72m £10.89m £6.49m £12.04m
Expenditure - Investment management £359.00k £359.00k £170.00k £404.00k £375.17k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £98.70m £94.33m £96.02m £80.11m £66.88m
Long-term investments £193.93m £189.11m £193.58m £182.27m £186.47m
Other assets £26.26m £22.50m £21.96m £36.24m £36.27m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£7.17m -£15.79m -£3.08m -£1.37m -£1.23m
Total liabilities £27.80m £26.12m £18.34m £18.13m £18.81m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Methodist Church House
25 Tavistock Place
London
WC1H 9SF
Phone:
02074865502