LIFE WITH HOPE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity, under the name Battle Baptist Church, advances the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination, provides education for the public benefit, meets the practical and spiritual needs of the local community and engages in other similar charitable activities as the trustees may decide from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Standard registration
- BATTLE BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- ZION BAPTIST CHURCH, BATTLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Dudgeon | Chair | 24 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Cindy Messetter | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ian John Terrell | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lynn Noel | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Nicol Hamilton | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD DAVID JONES | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.70k | £233.44k | £213.51k | £238.05k | £239.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.30k | £248.11k | £219.79k | £232.54k | £257.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 DECEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Battle Baptist Church
Mount Street
BATTLE
East Sussex
TN33 0EG
- Phone:
- 01424774825
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window