Financial history SHIPTON-UNDER-WYCHWOOD WILD GARDEN AND WOODS

Charity Number: 1133334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £12.00k £23.13k £19.84k £13.96k £43.91k
Total expenditure £19.04k £12.57k £12.57k £11.59k £14.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.50k N/A N/A £9.50k