Trustees NEWARK AND SOUTHWELL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134276

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
43 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nathan Falla | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janice Carol Wright | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Derek Trowbridge | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin William Jackson | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Haydn Dando | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD CHARLES ADAMS | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Winnington | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Linda Swinney | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ward | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mary Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jill Suter | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul James Fairfax | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Barrie Morley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Mary Blundy Lyn | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Peterson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Meakin | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Louise Everett | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Hibberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ROSEMARY HARDY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Silver | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Swift | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus James Silver | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Margaret Dalby | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Gascoyne | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Pepper | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Patricia Boneham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raymond George Atkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Watson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Beech | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN JACQUELINE YEOMANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL STROWGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN GODFREY PETER MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALYN ANN BEASLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CLIFFORD WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE ANNE PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY KENNETH AYERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT OWEN YEOMANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ALISON DANDO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MEL WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.