WHY ME? UK

Charity number: 1137123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Why me? Transforming Lives through Restorative Justice

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £272,338
Total expenditure: £290,403

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David John Munro Chair 13 October 2021
JOSEPHINE BAKER TRUST
Received: On time
FARNHAM SWIMMING BATHS TRUST
Received: On time
SURREY MINORITY ETHNIC FORUM LTD
Received: On time
Wrecclesham Community Centre
Received: On time
Marianne Helen Helps Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Emma Jones Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Timothy Chapman Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Ben Andrew Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Julia Dawson Trustee 29 November 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PAUL'S, ST. MARYLEBONE
Received: On time
Brian Neale Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Will Jacks Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
Matthew Pink Trustee 05 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £241.77k £344.14k £377.00k £415.71k £272.34k
Total expenditure £223.44k £291.65k £457.00k £355.06k £290.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £36.00k N/A
Income from government grants £27.76k N/A N/A £36.00k £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 06 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 04 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 02 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3Space International House
6 Canterbury Crescent
London
SW9 7QD
Phone:
020 45911970